OR SB1557 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires community colleges, public universities and Oregon Health and Science University to provide certain rights to students ordered to federal or state active duty for 30 or fewer consecutive days. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to students ordered to active duty; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateEffective date, April 3, 2018.
2018-04-11SenateChapter 82, 2018 Laws.
2018-04-03SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-02SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-01SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Boquist, Kruse.
2018-02-27HouseThird reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Evans, Gorsek, Olson.
2018-02-26HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2018-02-22HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
2018-02-19HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-02-19SenateThird reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Kruse, Riley.
2018-02-16SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2018-02-14SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-12SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Education.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-01-22SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/SB1557
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1557/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1557/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1557/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1557/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1557/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1557/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27161
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=431797
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27284
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=432871
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433169

Bill Comments

feedback