OR SB1556 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Effective date, March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Effective date, March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services to establish certification process for direct care providers of home or community-based services and implement online registry of direct care providers of home or community-based services. Requires Department of Human Services to establish certification process for direct care providers of home or community-based services and implement online registry of direct care providers of home or community-based services. Specifies requirements for certification and information to be displayed on online registry. Requires department to work with stakeholder groups to design certification requirements, explore ways to improve skill level and training of caregivers and improve caregivers' pathways to continued education and advancement. Sunsets January 2, 2024. Requires department to report to Joint Interim Committee on Ways and Means on work with stakeholders and on implementation of certification process and registry. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to caregivers; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and be referred to Rules and to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and be referred to Rules and to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Senate | Effective date, March 23, 2022. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 95, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 18--Bonham, Cate, George, Goodwin, Hayden, Hieb, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Reschke, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 3--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Scharf. |
2022-03-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 18--Bonham, Cate, George, Goodwin, Hayden, Hieb, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Reschke, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 3--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Scharf. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 4, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-03-03 | House | Second reading. |
2022-03-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 8--Anderson, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Thomsen; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Boquist, Robinson. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2022-02-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Rules then to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and requesting referral to Rules. Referred to Rules by order of the President then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Informational Meeting held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery, then Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |