OR SB1556 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Oregon Liquor Control Commission to create data and analysis regarding commercial sales and commercial industries. Authorizes commission to contract for services related to creating, marketing, selling or licensing use of data and analysis. Provides for disposition of moneys received from selling or licensing use of data and analysis. Establishes Oregon Liquor Control Commission Information Technology Infrastructure Fund. Appropriates fund moneys to commission for paying costs related to data and analysis program and for procuring, operating, maintaining, staffing and servicing information system hardware, software and supplies related to operational or revenue generating functions of commission. Appropriates commission net share of revenue from data and analysis program to fund.] Authorizes commission to negotiate certain distilled liquor prices with Indian tribes and commercial airlines. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Oregon Liquor Control Commission; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-28SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2020-02-27SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-20SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2020-02-20SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-19SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-12SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2020-02-12SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-03SenateReferred to General Government and Emergency Preparedness, then Ways and Means.
2020-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-01-27SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback