OR SB1556 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits county from bringing claim or action against person if claim or action is based on statement in trust deed that nominee or agent of lender is grantee or beneficiary, based on county's recording or indexing instrument that states that nominee or agent of lender is grantee or beneficiary or based on person's having obtained or transferred interest in trust deed by means of instrument that was executed or delivered to person but was not recorded in county's deeds and mortgages records or in county's County Clerk Lien Record. Prohibits county clerk from charging or collecting fee for instrument that transfers interest in trust deed and that was executed and delivered to person but was not presented for recording. Applies to claims that arise before, on or after January 1, 2018, but does not apply to actions that commenced before January 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to trust deeds; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-03-03HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2018-03-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-03-01SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hansell, Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-01SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-28SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2018-02-27SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-20SenateReferred to Rules by order of the President.
2018-02-20SenateRecommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
2018-02-15SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-07SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-01-22SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback