OR SB1556 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Effective date, March 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to contract preferences for federally funded transit projects; and declaring an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to contract preferences for federally funded transit projects; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-20 Effective date, March 16, 2012.
2012-03-20 Chapter 58, 2012 Laws.
2012-03-16 Governor signed.
2012-03-01 Co-Speakers signed.
2012-02-29 President signed.
2012-02-27 Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed. Ayes, 60.
2012-02-24 Second reading.
2012-02-23 Recommendation: Do pass.
2012-02-22 Public Hearing and Work Session held.
2012-02-17 Referred to Business and Labor.
2012-02-17 First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers.
2012-02-17 Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Starr.
2012-02-16 Second reading.
2012-02-16 Recommendation: Do pass.
2012-02-14 Work Session held.
2012-02-09 Public Hearing held.
2012-02-01 Referred to Business, Transportation and Economic Development.
2012-02-01 Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback