OR SB1555 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Effective date, July 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Effective date, July 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to hostile education environments; and prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to hostile education environments; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Effective date, July 1, 2012. | |
2012-03-20 | Chapter 57, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-03-16 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-29 | President signed. | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-02-24 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-23 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-02-22 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-17 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2012-02-16 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-02-15 | Third reading. Carried by Verger. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Atkinson. | |
2012-02-14 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-14 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-02-13 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |