OR SB1554 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies that amount in account established for higher education expenses is disregarded for purposes of determining account owner's financial eligibility to receive assistance or benefit authorized by law, other than means-tested state financial aid for higher education, to extent permitted under federal law. Specifies that amount in account established for higher education expenses is disregarded for purposes of determining account owner's financial eligibility to receive assistance or benefit authorized by law, other than means-tested state financial aid for higher education, to extent permitted under federal law. Directs Higher Education Coordinating Commission to study potential effects on financial aid programs of excluding amounts in accounts established for higher education expenses from determination of expected family contributions and to study policies to incentivize saving for higher education expenses among families at or below median income. Applies to eligibility determinations made on or after January 1, 2019. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to determination of eligibility for public benefits of higher education savings account owner; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateEffective date, June 2, 2018.
2018-04-11SenateChapter 80, 2018 Laws.
2018-04-03SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-02HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 49; Excused for Business of the House, 11--Gomberg, Holvey, McLane, Nathanson, Noble, Rayfield, Smith G, Smith Warner, Stark, Whisnant, Williamson.
2018-03-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2018 Calendar.
2018-03-01HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-28HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-27HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-22HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
2018-02-15HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-02-15SenateThird reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 24; Excused, 6--Gelser, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Kruse, Riley.
2018-02-14SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-13SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2018-02-12SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Education.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-01-22SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback