OR SB1553 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that debt collector engages in unlawful collection practice if debt collector is debt buyer, or is acting on debt buyer's behalf, and collects or attempts to collect purchased debt before providing to debtor, within 30 days after date of debtor's request, certain documents that establish nature and amount of debt. Requires insurers, fraternal benefit societies and certain nonprofit corporations to apply to and obtain from Secretary of State authorization to transact business in this state. Specifies effect of failing to obtain authorization. Requires insurer, fraternal benefit society or nonprofit corporation to maintain registered agent and registered office in this state.] Permits plaintiff to recover greater of $5,000 or actual damages in cause of action that arises out of business or transaction with insurer, fraternal benefit society or nonprofit corporation that has not obtained authorization to transact business in state. Permits Secretary of State to impose civil penalty of not more than $1,000 for failure to obtain authorization to transact business in this state.] Imposes public safety assessment on covered entities. Establishes Public Safety Assessment Fund. Transfers revenues to fund. Applies to calendar years beginning on or after January 1, 2019.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to regulation of certain business entities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateEffective date, January 1, 2019.
2018-04-11SenateChapter 79, 2018 Laws.
2018-04-03SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard.
2018-03-03HouseSecond reading.
2018-03-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-03-03HouseWork Session held.
2018-03-02HouseReferred to Rules.
2018-03-02HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-03-02SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-02SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) Amdendments distributed.
2018-03-02SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Finance and Revenue.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-01-22SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback