OR SB1552 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies that public utility that makes sales of electricity may not establish rate for any service that provides public utility with rate of return that exceeds 4.5 percent. Changes procedures by which public utilities that make sales of electricity file rate schedules with Public Utility Commission. Reduces public purpose charge collected from retail electricity consumers. Makes changes to agreement entered into between commission and nongovernmental entity for purpose of expending moneys collected as part of public purpose charge. Repeals provisions of law related to collection of surcharge for removal of Klamath River dams upon failure of relevant parties to begin dam removal. Directs PacifiCorp to credit electric bill of each customer from which PacifiCorp collected surcharge in amount that equals total amount paid by customer as surcharge, plus four percent. Prohibits Public Utility Commission from approving rate schedule established by public utility that makes sales of electricity if moneys collected pursuant to imposition of those rates would be used to remediate Superfund site. Specifies that each Public Utility Commissioner and each employee of commission must enter into noncompetition agreement with state under which commissioner or employee may not be subsequently employed by public utility that makes sales of electricity for two years. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to utility regulation; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-14SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Business and Transportation.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-01-22SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback