OR SB1551 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-10)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Effective date, June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires person that owns, licenses or otherwise possesses personal information that was subject to breach of security or that received notice of breach of security from another person that maintains or otherwise possesses personal information on person's behalf, to notify consumer to whom personal information pertains and, if number of consumers to whom person must send notice exceeds 250, to Attorney General. Requires person that owns, licenses , has control over or has access to] or otherwise possesses personal information and] that was subject to breach of security or that received notice of breach of security from another person that maintains or otherwise possesses personal information on person's behalf, to notify consumer to whom personal information pertains and, if number of consumers to whom person must send notice exceeds 250, to Attorney General. Requires person that maintains or otherwise possesses personal information on behalf of another person to notify other person of breach of security. Requires person to give notice in most expeditious manner possible, without unreasonable delay, but not later than 45 days after discovering or receiving notice of breach of security. Requires person, in providing notice, to undertake reasonable measures necessary to determine sufficient contact information for notice recipients, to determine scope of breach of security and to restore reasonable integrity, security and confidentiality of personal information. Provides that if person must notify consumer of breach of security and with notice person offers credit monitoring services or identity theft prevention and mitigation services without charge to consumer, person may not condition provision of services on consumer's providing person with credit card or debit card number or consumer's acceptance of any other service person offers for fee. Requires person to separately, distinctly, clearly and conspicuously disclose to consumer in any offer for additional credit monitoring services or identity theft prevention and mitigation services that person offers for fee that person will charge consumer fee. Prohibits consumer reporting agency from charging consumer fee or collecting from consumer money or item of value for placing, temporarily lifting or removing security freeze on consumer's consumer report, creating or deleting protective record, placing or removing security freeze on protective record or replacing lost personal identification number or password. Modifies standards for safeguarding personal information. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to actions after a breach of security that involves personal information; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateEffective date, June 2, 2018.
2018-04-23SenateChapter 010, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-16SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-02SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-01HouseThird reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Nearman; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
2018-02-28HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-27HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2018-02-26HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-22HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2018-02-21HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-02-21SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-02-20SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-19SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2018-02-15SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-15SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-09SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-01-22SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/SB1551
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1551/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1551/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1551/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1551/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1551/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1551/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27229
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=432118
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27303
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433319
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433513

Bill Comments

feedback