OR SB1550 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allows expanded practice dental hygienist to perform interim therapeutic restoration. Requires agreement between dentist and expanded practice dental hygienist to include expanded practice dental hygienist's scope of practice regarding interim therapeutic restorations. Defines "interim therapeutic restoration." Directs Oregon Board of Dentistry to adopt rules to establish educational and instructional requirements for interim therapeutic restoration and to approve applications from education providers for training courses that meet requirements. Requires certain expanded practice dental hygienists to complete approved training course. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to interim therapeutic restorations; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-03-05HouseCarried over to March 8, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-03-04HouseCarried over to March 5, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-03-03HouseCarried over to March 4, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-03-02HouseCarried over to March 3, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-28HouseCarried over to March 2, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-27HouseCarried over to February 28, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-26HouseCarried over to February 27, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-25HouseCarried over to February 26, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-24HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-21HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-20HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-17HouseReferred to Health Care.
2020-02-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-02-13SenateVote explanation filed by Boquist.
2020-02-13SenateThird reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Burdick, Olsen.
2020-02-12SenateSecond reading.
2020-02-11SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2020-02-04SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Health Care.
2020-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-01-27SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback