OR SB1550 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes State Fish and Wildlife Commission to adopt record keeping requirements for person engaged in taking, landing, buying or selling of food fish for commercial purposes or otherwise dealing in food fish for commercial purposes. Creates exception. Allows commission and Director of Agriculture], State Department of Fish and Wildlife, State Department of Agriculture or designees to examine records. Authorizes commission to undertake surveys, investigations and inquiries regarding food fish. Requires commission to undertake survey, investigation or inquiry requested by director. Requires commission to report to director on results of completed surveys, investigations or inquiries.] Allows State Department of Agriculture to request record copies and information for purpose of food safety law programs. Allows department to enter premises where records are kept as part of general pattern of administration and enforcement of food safety laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to food fish.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17SenateEffective date, January 1, 2019.
2018-04-17SenateChapter 104, 2018 Laws.
2018-04-10SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-02HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-01SenatePresident signed.
2018-02-27HouseThird reading. Carried by Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Evans, Gorsek, Olson.
2018-02-26HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-22HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
2018-02-19HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-02-19SenateThird reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Kruse, Riley.
2018-02-16SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2018-02-14SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-09SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-01-22SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback