OR SB1549 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Effective date, March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Effective date, March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Excepts persons authorized to engage in public accountancy in this state from provisions regulating investigators. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the regulation of investigators; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Effective date, March 6, 2014. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Chapter 46, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-02-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2014-02-24 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-21 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2014-02-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |