OR SB1548 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Essential Health Benefits Advisory Committee to advise Department of Consumer and Business Services on anticipated financial impact to state of pending legislation requiring coverage of additional health benefit in health benefit plans offered in this state. Specifies membership and duties of committee. Takes effect October 1, 2020.
Title
Relating to health insurance benefits; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Measures/Overview/SB1548 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1548/Introduced |