OR SB1543 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Effective date, March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Effective date, March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for nonprofit organization that addresses and executes worker relief to serve as fiscal agent to award grants to organizations to provide services related to immigration matters through universal representation program. Provides for nonprofit organization that addresses and executes worker relief to serve as fiscal agent to award grants to organizations to provide services related to immigration matters through universal representation program. Requires fiscal agent to report annually to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly, Oregon Department of Administrative Services and Legislative Fiscal Officer. Directs Chief Justice of Supreme Court to transfer funds to Oregon State Bar for use by Legal Services Program to provide legal services to individuals on immigration matters and related matters. Establishes Universal Representation Fund in State Treasury. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Department of Administrative Services for purposes of deposit in Universal Representation Fund. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Judicial Department for purposes of transfer to Oregon State Bar. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to universal representation; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Senate | Effective date, March 23, 2022. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 88, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Scharf. |
2022-03-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Grayber. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 21--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Cate, George, Goodwin, Hayden, Hieb, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Reschke, Scharf, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 1--Boshart Davis. |
2022-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 3, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 8--Anderson, Findley, Girod, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Hansell, Heard; Excused, 3--Boquist, Frederick, Robinson. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation, then Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |