OR SB1542 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Dedicates portion of State Capitol State Park to Vietnam War memorial to be funded and constructed by qualified nonprofit corporation . Dedicates portion of State Capitol State Park to Vietnam War memorial to be funded and constructed by qualified nonprofit corporation recognized and acknowledged by Director of Veterans' Affairs]. Exempts memorial from certain land use laws. Directs Department of Veterans' Affairs] State Parks and Recreation Department to maintain finished memorial. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to a memorial to Oregon's Vietnam War veterans; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-24 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson, Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Gelser. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Veterans. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |