OR SB1542 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date, April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes program administered by Home Care Commission to allow private payers to purchase home care services from commission through registry maintained by commission. Requires commission to establish payment rates based on costs to commission for program. Requires commission to appointÙ convene subcommittee to establish classification system for home care workers. Requires commission to establish qualifications, training standards and occupational health and safety standards for home care workers. Specifies purposes for which commission is employer of home care workers. Provides that state is not employer of home care workers except for specified purposes. Excludes home care workers from Public Employees Retirement System and Oregon Public Service Retirement Plan and from benefits offered by Public Employees' Benefit Board. Requires that commission must implement Act by January 1, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to in-home care providers; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03SenateEffective date, April 1, 2014.
2014-04-03SenateChapter 116, 2014 Laws.
2014-04-01SenateGovernor signed.
2014-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-11SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-07HouseThird reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed.Ayes, 43; Nays, 14--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, McLane, Olson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Keny-Guyer, Thompson; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley.
2014-03-06HouseSecond reading.
2014-03-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2014-03-05HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2014-03-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2014-03-05SenateClose, granted unanimous consent to change vote from nay to aye.
2014-03-05SenateThird reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed.Ayes, 21; nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Whitsett.
2014-03-04SenateSecond reading.
2014-03-04SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)Amendments distributed.
2014-03-03SenateWork Session held.
2014-02-26SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2014-02-26SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-17SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2014-02-12SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2014-02-11SenateWork Session held.
2014-02-10SenatePublic Hearing held.
2014-02-03SenateReferred to Health Care and Human Services, then Ways and Means.
2014-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/SB1542
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1542/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1542/Senate%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1542/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1542/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1542/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1542/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20035
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20243
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318892
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=319195

Bill Comments

feedback