OR SB1541 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Effective date, April 10, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Environmental Quality Commission to adopt program and rules to reduce public health risks from emissions of toxic air contaminants from individual stationary industrial and commercial air contamination sources. Authorizes commission to establish by rule pilot program for evaluating and controlling public health risks from toxic air contaminant emissions from multiple stationary air contamination sources. Allows Department of Environmental Quality, pursuant to rules adopted by commission, to regulate individual existing air contamination source under program or pilot program based on adjusted benchmark for excess noncancer risk. Sunsets January 1, 2029. Authorizes commission to establish fee applicable to certain air contamination sources to cover direct and indirect costs of developing and implementing individual air contamination source program and rules or pilot program. Provides that fees first become due and payable no earlier than July 1, 2019. Places temporary limits on fee increases. Sunsets temporary limits on January 2, 2024. Requires certain air contamination sources to pay to department one-time supplemental fee to pay expenses of department and commission in developing and implementing individual air contamination source program or pilot program. Sets forth supplemental fee to be paid based on permit type applicable to source. Limits certain biennial expenditures. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to toxic air contaminants; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17SenateEffective date, April 10, 2018.
2018-04-17SenateChapter 102, 2018 Laws.
2018-04-10SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03HouseVote explanation(s) filed by McLain, Smith DB, Speaker Kotek.
2018-03-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Nearman, Post, Smith DB; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard.
2018-03-02HouseSecond reading.
2018-03-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2018-03-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-03-01SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Dembrow, Girod. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-01SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) Amendments distributed.
2018-02-28SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-27SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2018-02-27SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-26SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2018-02-14SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-12SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-01-22SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/SB1541
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1541/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1541/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1541/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1541/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1541/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1541/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27178
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27357
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433287
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433981

Bill Comments

feedback