OR SB1540 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds provisions regarding child abuse investigations conducted on school premises. Modifies definition of child abuse for purpose of mandatory reporting.] Expands scope of investigation of abuse of persons with mental illness or substance use disorders that may be conducted by Department of Human Services or Oregon Health Authority. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to abuse of vulnerable individuals; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Effective date, April 3, 2018. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Chapter 77, 2018 Laws. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed. Ayes, 49; Excused for Business of the House, 11--Gomberg, Holvey, McLane, Nathanson, Noble, Rayfield, Smith G, Smith Warner, Stark, Whisnant, Williamson. |
2018-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2018-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Referred to Rules. |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules suspended. Consideration of Committee Report and Minority Report carried over to February 28, 2018 Calendar. |
2018-02-26 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2018-02-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng bill. |
2018-02-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2018-02-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Vote explanations filed by Boquist, Thatcher. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, DeBoer, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Kruse, Riley, Winters. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |