OR SB154 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset of program under which property constituting solar project may be exempt and instead pay fee in lieu of property taxes. Extends sunset of program under which property constituting solar project may be exempt and instead pay fee in lieu of property taxes. Provides that agreement between county and owner or person in possession or control of solar project must indicate property tax treatment of land on which solar project is located and set rate of fee within range of $5,500 to $7,000 per megawatt of nameplate capacity. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to solar projects; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, September 25, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 571, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-07-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 6--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Cate, Leif, Post, Zika; Excused, 3--Hayden, Morgan, Smith G. |
2021-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-23 | House | Referred to Tax Expenditures. |
2021-06-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 6--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment, then Tax Expenditures. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |