OR SB1539 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Oregon Psychiatric Access Line program in Oregon Health and Science University. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to telephone access by primary care providers to psychiatric physician consultations; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-08SenateRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-07SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Health Care, then Ways and Means.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-01-22SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback