OR SB1538 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At President's desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes city, county, metropolitan service district, school district, college or university to adopt ordinance or policy limiting or precluding affirmative defense for possession of firearms in public buildings by concealed handgun licensees. Modifies definition of "public building" for purposes of crime of unlawful possession of weapon in public building. Punishes violation by maximum of five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Rules (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt President's desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-12SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2020-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-01-27SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback