OR SB1530 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies statewide greenhouse gas emissions reduction goals. Establishes Oregon Greenhouse Gas Initiative and related provisions, operative January 1, 2022. Authorizes Public Utility Commission to allow rate or rate schedule to include differential rates or to reflect amounts for programs that enable public utilities to assist low-income residential customers. Authorizes commission to allow electric companies and natural gas utilities to recover costs for prudent investments in or expenses for infrastructure measures that support adoption and service of alternative forms of transportation.] Amends greenhouse gas reporting statute. Repeals Energy Facility Siting Council carbon dioxide emissions standards. Provides that energy facility subject to site certificate or amended site certificate shall comply with Oregon Greenhouse Gas Initiative if energy facility would otherwise be subject to initiative. Requires Environmental Quality Commission to adopt by rule standards and requirements for reducing methane emissions from landfills. Requires Environmental Quality Commission to regulate use of hydrofluorocarbons in certain products.] Abolishes Oregon Global Warming Commission, operative December 31, 2020. Repeals authority of State Forester to establish forestry carbon offset program. Modifies requirements for ethanol content in gasoline. Prohibits sale or offer for sale of general service lamps that do not meet certain efficiency standards. Authorizes State Department of Energy to modify prohibition by rule to align with laws of adjacent states. Provides for direct, expedited judicial review by Oregon Supreme Court of certain constitutional questions related to Oregon Greenhouse Gas Initiative. Requires certain reports and reviews related to Oregon Greenhouse Gas Initiative. Establishes, within Department of Environmental Quality, Oregon Greenhouse Gas Reduction Board, Administrator of the Office of Greenhouse Gas Regulation and Office of Greenhouse Gas Regulation and sets forth duties of board, administrator and office. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to greenhouse gas emissions; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-03-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2020-02-24SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-19SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2020-02-19SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-18SenateWork Session cancelled.
2020-02-17SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-14SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
2020-02-14SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-14SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2020-02-13SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-11SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-08SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled.
2020-02-06SenatePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means.
2020-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-01-27SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback