OR SB1530 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to funding for technology projects for the Department of Revenue; appropriating money; prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to funding for technology projects for the Department of Revenue; appropriating money; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2012-02-23 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-22 | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. | |
2012-02-17 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-17 | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage but w/amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) | |
2012-02-17 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-13 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-06 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Finance and Revenue, then Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |