OR SB1528 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alters method by which moneys are distributed to school districts for purpose of paying for costs of education of students in eligible day treatment programs and eligible residential treatment programs. Takes effect July 1, 2014.
Title
Relating to funding for education of students in treatment programs; appropriating money; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Rod Monroe [D] | Rep. Val Hoyle [D] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Sen. Richard Devlin [D] |
Sen. Fred Girod [R] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Rep. Peter Buckley [D] | Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] |
Rep. Betty Komp [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage, but w/amendments and referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage but w/amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue, then Ways and Means. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |