OR SB1527 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies requirements for enforceable noncompetition agreement. Makes noncompliant agreement void. Limits term of noncompetition agreement to six] 12 months. Modifies definition of "noncompetition agreement."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to noncompetition agreements.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-25HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-24HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-19HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-17HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2020-02-17HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-02-17SenateVote explanation filed by Boquist.
2020-02-17SenateThird reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Gelser.
2020-02-13SenateSecond reading.
2020-02-12SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2020-02-11SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-06SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Labor and Business.
2020-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-01-27SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback