OR SB1527 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Effective date, March 13, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Effective date, March 13, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Business Development Department, in coordination with local workforce investment boards, to contract with private or public entities to develop Dislocated Worker Training Program as pilot program to enable unemployed and underemployed engineers and industry professionals in bioscience and manufacturing traded sector industries to be reemployed in Oregon. Requires report to Legislative Assembly on or before February 1, 2016. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to department for deposit in Industry Competitiveness Fund to implement program.Ù Allocates moneys from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund to department for program. Limits expenditures. Sunsets June 30, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to dislocated worker training program; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Senate | Effective date, March 13, 2014. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Chapter 70, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gallegos. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Berger, Conger, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2014-03-05 | House | Second reading. |
2014-03-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2014-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Devlin. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--George. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Education and Workforce Development, then Ways and Means. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |