OR SB1526 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes limits on campaign contributions that may be accepted by candidates and political committees. Establishes limits on campaign contributions that may be accepted by candidates and political committees. Requires political committee to identify as caucus, measure, multicandidate, political party, recall or small donor political committee. Prohibits person from controlling more than one of each committee. Authorizes Secretary of State and Attorney General to require return of contribution excess of limits and impose civil penalty up to 150 percent of total amount of contribution. Establishes Small Donor Elections Program to enable candidates for office of state Representative and state Senator to receive 6-to-1 match on small dollar donations. Limits matching funds. Allows resident taxpayers to designate contribution to Small Donor Elections Fund on income tax return form. Directs most election law penalties to Small Donor Elections Fund. Repeals Ballot Measure 47 (2006), currently held in abeyance, which establishes limits on political campaign contributions and independent expenditures on candidate races and establishes certain campaign finance disclosure requirements. Becomes operative November 6, 2024. Refers Act to people for approval or rejection at next general election.
Title
Relating to campaign finance; providing that this Act shall be referred to the people for their approval or rejection.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2022R1/Measures/Overview/SB1526 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2022R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1526/Introduced |