OR SB1523 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Extends sunset for modified method of apportionment of business income of interstate broadcaster for purposes of corporate excise taxation. Continues use of gross receipts from customers with in-state commercial domicile in numerator of apportionment percentage calculation. Requires gross receipts of broadcaster to be included in numerator if member of affiliated group filing consolidated state return, regardless of whether interstate broadcaster has taxable presence in state.] First applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2017.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to apportionment of income for interstate broadcasters; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateEffective date, June 2, 2018.
2018-04-11SenateChapter 73, 2018 Laws.
2018-04-03SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03SenateRules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-02HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Smith Warner; Excused, 1--Kennemer; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Nathanson.
2018-03-02HouseSecond reading.
2018-03-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2018-02-28HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-27HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-15HouseReferred to Revenue.
2018-02-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-02-13SenateThird reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Kruse, Riley.
2018-02-12SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-12SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-09SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-06SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Finance and Revenue.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-01-22SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/SB1523
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1523/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1523/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1523/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1523/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27101
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=431133
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27347
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433681
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433799

Bill Comments

feedback