OR SB1520 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands definition of term "eligible student." Modifies school reimbursement rates for purposes of schools that provide free or reduced price meals under National School Lunch Program or School Breakfast Program. Makes state funding available at earlier date for summer programs at certain schools considered to be high poverty under Title I of federal Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to programs that distribute state moneys to public schools receiving federal moneys; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-25HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-24HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-24HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-19HousePublic Hearing cancelled.
2020-02-17HousePublic Hearing cancelled.
2020-02-12HouseReferred to Education.
2020-02-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-02-11SenateVote explanation filed by Boquist.
2020-02-11SenateThird reading. Carried by Heard. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Fagan, President Courtney.
2020-02-10SenateSecond reading.
2020-02-10SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-06SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Education.
2020-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-01-27SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback