OR SB1519 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Effective date, March 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Effective date, March 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires dentist to test, at least once per week, autoclave or other heat sterilization device. Directs Oregon Board of Dentistry to dismiss disciplinary matter that is pending on effective date of Act if matter concerns whether dentist tested autoclave or other heat sterilization device less frequently than once per week. Directs board to expunge from records findings and conclusions of disciplinary action taken before effective date of Act if action concerns whether dentist tested such device less frequently than once per week. Directs board, with respect to licensee who board disciplined for testing autoclave or other heat sterilization device less frequently than once per week, to remove licensee's name from website where name is posted in connection with such disciplinary action and to pay licensee amount equal to any civil penalty imposed by board pursuant to such action. Specifies that dentist has cause of action against person with whom dentist entered into agreement for testing autoclave or other heat sterilization device if person communicated to dentist that dentist was in compliance with rules adopted by board and dentist was disciplined by board. Specifies that licensee who board disciplined for testing autoclave or other heat sterilization device less frequently than once per week may not bring cause of action against entity that tested for licensee autoclave or other heat sterilization device on grounds related to that testing. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to dentistry; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Effective date, March 3, 2014. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Chapter 16, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Davis, Esquivel; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Thompson. |
2014-02-20 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-19 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2014-02-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Girod declared potential conflict of interest. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |