OR SB1518 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on February 24 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Human Services to submit documents necessary to finalize certain pending adoptions on or before June 30, 2020. Directs department to report to Legislative Assembly regarding adoption of rule for purposes of federal Family First Prevention Services Act. Modifies definition of "exempt prohibited individual" for purposes of Central Background Registry. Modifies availability of conditional enrollment in Central Background Registry. Declares that person may not be disqualified from service as child welfare service provider based on certain traits. Declares that child, ward or youth may not be prohibited from, disciplined for or retaliated against for publicly or privately speaking about child's, ward's or youth's experience receiving child welfare services. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to children; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-03-05HouseCarried over to March 8, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-03-04HouseCarried over to March 5, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-03-03HouseCarried over to March 4, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-03-02HouseCarried over to March 3, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-28HouseCarried over to March 2, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-27HouseCarried over to February 28, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-26HouseCarried over to February 27, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-25HouseCarried over to February 26, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-24HouseThird Reading commenced. Carried over to February 25, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-21HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-20HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-19HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-17HousePublic Hearing scheduled.
2020-02-12HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing.
2020-02-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-02-11SenateVote explanation filed by Boquist.
2020-02-11SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Fagan, President Courtney.
2020-02-10SenateSecond reading.
2020-02-07SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2020-02-05SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-03SenateInformational Meeting scheduled.
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Human Services.
2020-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-01-27SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback