OR SB1516 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Small Business Expansion Loan Fund to be administered by Oregon Business Development Department for purpose of making loans of early stage growth capital to individuals and business entities with 50 or fewer employees that may not be able to obtain adequate traditional commercial or private financing to meet operational and growth needs. Provides that no individual loan may be made for amount greater than $2 million. Authorizes Oregon Business Development Commission to transfer moneys in Oregon Business Development Fund to Small Business Expansion Loan Fund when reasonable and financially appropriate for purpose of making loans under Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a small business expansion loan fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateEffective date, January 1, 2019.
2018-04-11SenateChapter 71, 2018 Laws.
2018-04-03SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard.
2018-03-02HouseSecond reading.
2018-03-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2018-03-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-03-01SenateJohnson declared potential conflict of interest.
2018-03-01SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-01SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) Amendments distributed.
2018-02-28SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-27SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2018-02-27SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-26SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-08SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2018-02-07SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Business and Transportation, then Ways and Means.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-01-22SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/SB1516
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1516/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1516/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1516/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1516/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1516/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1516/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27042
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27356
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433281
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433963

Bill Comments

feedback