OR SB1514 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date, March 20, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

The Act would require the Director of OED to conduct periodic assessments of the Paid Family and Medical Leave Insurance Fund. The Act would allow the director to take actions if the director found the fund to be insolvent. The Act would take effect when the Governor signs it. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.7). Requires the Director of the Employment Department to conduct periodic assessments to determine the solvency of the Paid Family and Medical Leave Insurance Fund. Specifies the actions that the director may take to restore solvency if the director determines that the fund is, or may be, insolvent. Requires the Director of the Employment Department to include in the department's biennial reports to the Legislative Assembly a summary of the periodic assessments conducted by the director and a summary of any actions taken by the director to restore solvency. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to family and medical leave insurance; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2024-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-25SenateEffective date, March 20, 2024.
2024-03-25SenateChapter 19, 2024 Laws.
2024-03-20SenateGovernor signed.
2024-03-04HouseSpeaker signed.
2024-03-01SenatePresident signed.
2024-02-27HouseThird reading. Carried by Grayber. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 3--Cate, Diehl, Yunker; Excused, 1--Boshart Davis; Excused for Business of the House, 6--Bowman, Helm, Javadi, Owens, Scharf, Speaker Rayfield.
2024-02-26HouseSecond reading.
2024-02-22HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2024-02-21HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2024-02-14HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2024-02-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2024-02-14SenateThird reading. Carried by Bonham. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Boquist, Hansell, Woods.
2024-02-13SenateSecond reading.
2024-02-13SenateSubsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
2024-02-13SenateRecommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
2024-02-07SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2024-02-05SenateInformational Meeting held.
2024-02-05SenateReferred to Labor and Business, then Ways and Means.
2024-02-05SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Measures/Overview/SB1514
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1514/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1514/Enrolled
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81193
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81417
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/280045
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81439
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/280206
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/280417
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81464
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/282109
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/82174
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/282346
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36638
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=608180
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36891
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=609455

Bill Comments

feedback