OR SB1514 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes periodic sunset review of state boards, commissions, committees, task forces and other executive department entities that meet certain criteria. Requires Legislative Policy and Research Director to establish roster and schedule of entities for periodic sunset review. Requires listed entities with periodic sunset review scheduled for next odd-numbered year regular session of Legislative Assembly to provide specified information, and requires director to compile and present information to committees and facilitate committee undertaking periodic sunset review. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to periodic sunset review of state government entities; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Accountability. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/SB1514 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1514/Introduced |