OR SB1511 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates process by which person convicted or found guilty except for insanity as result of nonunanimous jury verdict may file petition for post-conviction relief within one year of effective date of Act. Creates process by which person convicted or found guilty except for insanity as result of nonunanimous jury verdict may file petition for post-conviction relief within one year of effective date of Act. Creates procedure by which person with post-conviction relief petition pending in circuit court or on appeal on effective date of Act may proceed under process. Directs court to instruct jury concerning certain unavailable evidence if conviction is vacated and case is retried. Appropriates moneys to Emergency Board for allocation to Department of Justice for expenses of department and other entities resulting from creation of process and retrial of vacated convictions. Sunsets on January 1, 2025] 2026. Temporarily authorizes district attorney to charge reasonable reimbursement fee for cost of providing copies of discovery materials in criminal case. Sunsets on January 1, 2024. Removes requirement that court order presentence report when defendant convicted of specified offenses. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to crime; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Informational Meeting held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation, then Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |