OR SB1511 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Department of Fish and Wildlife to adopt by rule and administer program for authorizing voluntary projects for stream restoration and habitat improvement through construction of environmental restoration weirs. Exempts authorized projects from removal-fill permit. Exempts authorized projects from fish passage requirements in certain circumstances. Authorizes department to require fish passage as part of authorized project in certain circumstances. Authorizes department to require modification of environmental restoration weirs if found to adversely impact transportation infrastructure or planned transportation infrastructure. Authorizes department to require third-party monitoring of authorized projects. Provides that certain riparian work as part of authorized project is not subject to riparian management requirements under Oregon Forest Practices Act. Requires department to adopt rules establishing program in time for rules to become operative no later than one year after effective date of Act. Requires department to submit, no later than December 31, 2026, report to interim committees related to environment and natural resources of Legislative Assembly on extent and impact of program. Requires department to submit, no later than September 15, 2031, report to interim committees related to environment and natural resources of Legislative Assembly on environmental and economic impacts of program] assessments of conditions of qualifying streams affected by authorized voluntary projects and make recommendations for legislation. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to voluntary stream restoration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2020-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Boquist, Girod, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Olsen. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |