OR SB1506 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Public Records Advocate as independent office within executive department. Authorizes Public Records Advisory Council to appoint advocate. Authorizes council to support or oppose legislation relating to public records law and to request legislators to introduce legislation relating to public records law. Ratifies and affirms actions taken by council before effective date of Act to recruit and appoint advocate. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Public Records Advisory Council; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-27HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-26HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-24HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-20HouseReferred to Rules.
2020-02-17HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-02-17SenateVote explanation filed by Boquist.
2020-02-17SenateThird reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Gelser.
2020-02-13SenateSecond reading.
2020-02-13SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-12SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-10SenatePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03SenateReferred to General Government and Emergency Preparedness.
2020-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-01-27SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback