OR SB1506 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Transportation to issue Oregon Wounded Warrior parking permits to qualified applicants. Describes "wounded warrior." Permits person issued Oregon Wounded Warrior parking permit or person transporting person issued parking permit to park motor vehicle in any public parking zone restricted as to length of time permitted therein without incurring overtime penalties and to park motor vehicle in any public parking zone with metered parking without being required to pay any parking meter fee. Provides exceptions. Becomes operative January 1, 2019. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Oregon Wounded Warrior parking permits; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateEffective date, April 3, 2018.
2018-04-11SenateChapter 69, 2018 Laws.
2018-04-03SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard.
2018-03-02HouseSecond reading.
2018-03-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2018-03-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-03-01SenateLinthicum, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye.
2018-03-01SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-01SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-28SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-22SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2018-02-22SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-19SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-08SenateRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-07SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Business and Transportation, then Ways and Means.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-01-22SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback