OR SB1504 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Effective date, July 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Effective date, July 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that Multi-Jurisdictional Simulcasting and Interactive Wagering Totalizator Hub licensee may establish account for wagering on greyhound racing for individual unless wagering on live greyhound racing is unlawful in jurisdiction of individual's principal residence. Prohibits accepting wagers or providing gambling services in connection with greyhound racing. Punishes by maximum of five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both.] Prohibits wagering on greyhound racing. Punishes by maximum of 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both.] Provides that Multi-Jurisdictional Simulcasting and Interactive Wagering Totalizator Hub licensee may establish account for wagering on greyhound racing for individual unless wagering on live greyhound racing is unlawful in jurisdiction of individual's principal residence. Directs Oregon Racing Commission to provide annual report to Legislative Assembly on greyhound race wagers made in Oregon. Provides that commission may not grant licenses for greyhound race meets after effective date of Act. Takes effect July 1, 2023] 2022.
Title
Relating to greyhound racing; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Finance and Revenue (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Finance and Revenue (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2022. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 77, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 20--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Cate, George, Goodwin, Hayden, Hieb, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Scharf. |
2022-03-03 | House | Second reading. |
2022-03-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Armitage. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by President Courtney. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Boquist, Robinson. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2022-02-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and requesting referral to Finance and Revenue. Referral denied by order of the President. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation by order of the President. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |