OR SB1501 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Effective date, March 17, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Effective date, March 17, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Board of Forestry to adopt single rule package on or before November 30, 2022, to implement Private Forest Accord Report. Directs State Board of Forestry to adopt single rule package on or before November 30, 2022, to implement Private Forest Accord Report. Directs board to adopt rules related to post-disturbance harvest and to initiate rulemaking concerning tethered logging by certain dates. Establishes certain exemptions from requirements for just compensation for land use regulation. Directs State Forestry Department to procure services for development and application of landslide modeling. Directs board to submit habitat conservation plan consistent with Private Forest Accord Report, procure related services and apply for incidental take permit. Provides exemption from Oregon Forest Practices Act requirements related to species addressed in certain federal agreement. Establishes small forestland owner minimum options related to forest practices by small forestland owners. Directs board to adopt by rule Small Forestland Investment in Stream Habitat Program. Creates Small Forestland Owner Assistance Office within department. Establishes certain requirements and prohibitions related to beaver. Establishes Private Forest Accord Mitigation Advisory Committee. Directs State Fish and Wildlife Commission to establish by rule Private Forest Accord Grant Program. Directs board to establish by rule adaptive management program. Establishes Adaptive Management Program Committee and Independent Research and Science Team as advisory committees to board. Amends Oregon Forest Practices Act. Provides that policies do no affect treaty or other rights of Indian tribe or beneficial ownership interest of land held in trust for Indian tribe or held by Indian tribe] certain property rights of Indian tribe or tribally owned or operated corporation. Authorizes department to adopt rules related to pesticide applications. Makes operability of new provisions and amendments contingent on issuance of incidental take permit on or before December 31, 2027, and incidental take permit remaining in effect. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to certain agencies for certain purposes. Increases certain limitations on expenditures. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to a negotiated agreement concerning private forestland; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Senate | Effective date, March 17, 2022. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 33, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Hayden. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Helm. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 15--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Cate, George, Goodwin, Levy, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Weber, Wright; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Scharf. |
2022-03-03 | House | Second reading. |
2022-03-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 5--Anderson, Girod, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Boquist, Robinson. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2022-02-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Informational Meeting held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |