OR SB1501 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reduces minimum and maximum number of members for State Fair Council. Limits consecutive terms of service on council. Requires Governor to adjust terms of office for council members holding office on effective date of Act to achieve staggered expiration of member terms. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the State Fair Council; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateEffective date, June 2, 2018.
2018-04-11SenateChapter 068, 2018 Laws.
2018-04-03SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-02HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-01SenatePresident signed.
2018-02-27HouseThird reading. Carried by Clem. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Evans, Gorsek, Olson.
2018-02-26HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-22HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
2018-02-16HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-02-16SenateThird reading. Carried by President Courtney. Passed. Ayes, 25; Excused, 5--Hansell, Johnson, Kruse, Riley, Roblan.
2018-02-15SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-13SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-08SenatePossible Work Session cancelled.
2018-02-06SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05SenateReferred to General Government and Accountability.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-01-22SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback