OR SB15 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Public Utility Commission to study leasing or acquiring right of way for generation, transmission or distribution of electricity generated using solar energy. Requires Public Utility Commission to study leasing or acquiring right of way for generation, transmission or distribution of electricity generated using solar energy. Directs commission to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to energy no later than September 15, 2024.
Title
Relating to solar energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |