OR SB15 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Youth Development Division to inspect and collect data from facilities in which juveniles are detained to ensure compliance with federal Juvenile Justice and Delinquency Prevention Act. Authorizes Youth Development Council] Division to inspect and collect data from facilities in which juveniles are detained to ensure compliance with federal Juvenile Justice and Delinquency Prevention Act.
Title
Relating to compliance monitoring authority of the Youth Development Council.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Judiciary by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Judiciary by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 256, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Hernandez, Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Nosse, Rayfield. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Carried over to May 23, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-21 | House | Carried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-20 | House | Carried over to May 21, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-17 | House | Carried over to May 20, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-16 | House | Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-08 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Thomsen; Excused, 2--Roblan, Winters. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary by prior reference. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Judiciary by prior reference. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, then Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |