OR SB148 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-12 - Effective date, June 8, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-12 - Effective date, June 8, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes State Board of Pharmacy membership to include two licensed pharmacy technicians. Changes State Board of Pharmacy membership to include one licensed pharmacy technician and remove one member of public] two licensed pharmacy technicians. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the State Board of Pharmacy; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-12 | Senate | Effective date, June 8, 2015. |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Chapter 284, 2015 Laws. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Barreto, Nearman; Excused, 1--Hayden; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2015-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-21 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-20 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 21, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-19 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 20, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-14 | House | Second reading. |
2015-05-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-05-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-22 | House | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2015-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Knopp, Olsen, Whitsett. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |