OR SB147 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Third reading as Special Order of Business. Carried by Kennemer. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Smith G.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Consumer and Business Services to develop and report, no later than September 15, 2017, recommendations to Legislative Assembly and interim committees related to health for program to reimburse costs of oral health care for low-income individuals residing in Oregon under Compact of Free Association treaty. Sunsets January 2, 2020. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to oral health care for Pacific Islanders residing in the United States under a Compact of Free Association treaty; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HouseThird reading as Special Order of Business. Carried by Kennemer. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Smith G.
2017-05-18HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on May 25, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-17HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-16HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-15HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-11HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-10HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 10, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-08HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 9, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-04HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-03HouseSecond reading.
2017-05-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2017-05-01HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2017-03-29HouseReferred to Health Care.
2017-03-28HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2017-03-27SenateThird reading. Carried by Girod, Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
2017-03-23SenateSecond reading.
2017-03-23SenateSubsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
2017-03-23SenateRecommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
2017-03-21SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Health Care, then Ways and Means.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback