OR SB14 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes product stewardship program for plastic packaging and plastic food serviceware. Establishes product stewardship program for plastic packaging and plastic food serviceware. Establishes Plastics Stewardship Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to Department of Environmental Quality for purposes of Act. Imposes penalty for violation by manufacturer or stewardship organization of program provisions not to exceed $10,000 per day for each day of violation. Imposes penalty for violation of program provisions by retailer not to exceed $100 per day for each day of violation. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to plastics; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB14 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB14/Introduced |