OR SB137 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits coordinated care organization from contracting with any entity to assume risk of providing behavioral health services or to assume responsibility for utilization management, care coordination, denials of service, grievances or appeals. Specifies requirements for denials of services. Requires Oregon Health Authority to adopt rules governing utilization management of behavioral health services, network adequacy and procedures for members to file grievances and appeals directly with authority. Requires coordinated care organization to provide specified services to member who is hospitalized for behavioral health condition or who presents to emergency department needing behavioral health services. Repeals requirement that coordinated care organizations contract with community mental health programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to behavioral health services provided by coordinated care organizations.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2019-03-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Health Care.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback