OR SB133 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on June 9 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - President signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Places limits on admissibility of facilitated dialogue and responsibility letter bank programs for youth offenders and persons temporarily assigned to youth correction facilities. Places limits on admissibility of facilitated dialogue and responsibility letter bank programs for youth offenders and persons temporarily assigned to youth correction facilities. Authorizes Oregon Youth Authority to disclose certain information to victim at victim's request or when youth authority seeks information from victim to inform case plan or about potential impact of authorizing parole of youth offender. Authorizes juvenile court or] district attorney to provide victim, pursuant to protective order, with copy of written waiver findings and determination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to victims in juvenile cases.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-09HouseThird reading. Carried by Morgan. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Nearman, Williams; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Fahey, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-08HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-03HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-25HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-24HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-06HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-29HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-28SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Boquist.
2021-04-28SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 5--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 2--Heard, Kennemer.
2021-04-26SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-04-07SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-05SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback