OR SB131 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on June 2 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adds supervisors of youth correction facilities and juvenile community supervision officers to list of professionals required to make notification of death and cooperate in investigation of death by providing records and other materials. Adds supervisors of youth correction facilities and juvenile community supervision officers to list of professionals required to make notification of death and cooperate in investigation of death by providing records and other materials. Requires cooperation with both medical examiner and medical-legal death investigator.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to investigations of deaths.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-07SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-02HouseThird reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Clem, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-28HouseCarried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-05-27HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-26HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-25HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-25HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-18HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-11HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-03-15HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-03-10SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-03-10SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 11--Anderson, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen.
2021-03-04SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-04SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-02-04SenateWork Session held.
2021-01-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback